NE LB560 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for sales and use taxes on certain services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for sales and use taxes on certain services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-18 Indefinitely postponed
2012-01-04 Title printed. Carryover bill
2011-02-09 Notice of hearing for March 10, 2011
2011-01-21 Referred to Revenue Committee
2011-01-19 Date of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback