NE LB56 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend the State Electrical Act and update references to the National Electrical Code
Title
Amend the State Electrical Act and update references to the National Electrical Code
Sponsors
Sen. Heath Mello [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Approved by Governor on May 17, 2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Presented to Governor on May 11, 2011 | |
2011-05-11 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-05-11 | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-05-05 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on Select File | |
2011-04-28 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-03-08 | Placed on General File | |
2011-02-17 | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2011 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to General Affairs Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Date of introduction |