NE LB559 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the treatment of tax credits under the New Markets Job Growth Investment Act
Title
Change provisions relating to the treatment of tax credits under the New Markets Job Growth Investment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015 |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-04-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-04-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2015-04-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Williams priority bill |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 04, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |