NE LB556 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB557 amended into LB556 by AM383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB557 amended into LB556 by AM383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to prescriptions for controlled substances and the prescription drug monitoring program
Title
Change provisions relating to prescriptions for controlled substances and the prescription drug monitoring program
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Howard [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM383 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM383 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB557 amended into LB556 by AM383 |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 01, 2019 |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Wayne explanation of vote |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | M. Hansen explanation of vote |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 29, 2019 |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER67 adopted |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER67 filed |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER67 |
2019-04-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-08 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM383 adopted |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Howard priority bill |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM383 filed |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM383 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Briese name added |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |