NE LB553 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Bed Bug Detection and Treatment Act for cities of the metropolitan class
Title
Adopt the Bed Bug Detection and Treatment Act for cities of the metropolitan class
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |