NE LB55 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to self-sufficiency contracts and work activity requirements under the Welfare Reform Act
Title
Change provisions relating to self-sufficiency contracts and work activity requirements under the Welfare Reform Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Legislature - McKinney MO57 prevailed (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Bill withdrawn |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | McKinney MO57 prevailed |
2023-04-20 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-03-03 | Legislature | McKinney MO57 Withdraw LB55 filed |
2023-01-31 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |