NE LB55 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB55 amended into LB584 by AM181
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change a duty of landowners relating to the frequency of mowing roadside weeds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change a duty of landowners relating to the frequency of mowing roadside weeds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB55 amended into LB584 by AM181
2017-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 30, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback