NE LB538 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB538 amended into LB945 by AM1700
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB538 amended into LB945 by AM1700
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds for Legal Education for Public Service and Rural Practice Loan Repayment Assistance
Title
Appropriate funds for Legal Education for Public Service and Rural Practice Loan Repayment Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB538 amended into LB945 by AM1700 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2017 |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31643 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB538.pdf |