NE LB538 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Require audits of tax incentive programs under the Legislative Performance Audit Act and change tax incentive sunset dates
Title
Require audits of tax incentive programs under the Legislative Performance Audit Act and change tax incentive sunset dates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015 |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-04-14 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-04-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-04-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER58 adopted |
2015-03-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER58 filed |
2015-03-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER58 |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Watermeier AM944 adopted |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Watermeier AM944 filed |
2015-03-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2015-03-03 | Legislature | Legislative Performance Audit priority bill |
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |