NE LB532 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor on March 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor on March 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to property under the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act and the School Employees Retirement Act and change a security deposit provision under the Uniform Residential Landlord and Tenant Act
Title
Change provisions relating to property under the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act and the School Employees Retirement Act and change a security deposit provision under the Uniform Residential Landlord and Tenant Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Lowe [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 11, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-03-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-03-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER16 adopted |
2021-02-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER16 filed |
2021-02-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER16 |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |