NE LB53 | 2024 | 108th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-31 - Notice of hearing for August 01, 2024
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-31 - Notice of hearing for August 01, 2024
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide powers and duties for the Jail Standards Board for reimbursement of counties for jail expenses
Title
Provide powers and duties for the Jail Standards Board for reimbursement of counties for jail expenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for August 01, 2024 |
2024-07-30 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-07-29 | Legislature | Date of introduction |