NE LB53 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change and provide duties for landowners or their tenants relating to removal of a blockage or obstruction in a watercourse and provide for court costs and attorney's fees
Title
Change and provide duties for landowners or their tenants relating to removal of a blockage or obstruction in a watercourse and provide for court costs and attorney's fees
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37085 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB53.pdf |