NE LB529 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions for the distribution of lottery funds used for education, transfer powers and duties, create new acts and funds, and change education provisions
Title
Change provisions for the distribution of lottery funds used for education, transfer powers and duties, create new acts and funds, and change education provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Legislature - Walz MO72 failed (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO70 failed (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Legislature - Education AM495 adopted (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Legislature - Walz FA10 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO70 failed (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Legislature - Education AM495 adopted (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Legislature - Walz FA10 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB529 amended into LB528 by AM1458 |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Walz MO72 failed |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Walz MO72 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Hansen, M. MO71 pending |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Hansen, M. MO71 Reconsider the vote on MO70 filed |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO70 failed |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO70 pending |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Walz AM1090 pending |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO70 Recommit to Education Committee filed |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Walz AM678 withdrawn |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER31 adopted |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Murman AM1422 filed |
2021-04-22 | Legislature | Walz AM1090 filed |
2021-04-21 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA29 filed |
2021-04-21 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA28 filed |
2021-04-21 | Legislature | Murman AM990 filed |
2021-04-21 | Legislature | Walz AM1055 filed |
2021-03-29 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER31 filed |
2021-03-29 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER31 |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Education AM495 adopted |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Groene AM731 withdrawn |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Groene AM731 filed |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Murman AM719 withdrawn |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Chair ruled the adoption of AM719 would require 30 votes |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Morfeld point of order pending |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Murman AM719 pending |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Walz FA10 adopted |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Walz FA10 pending |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Walz FA10 filed |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Walz AM677 withdrawn |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Education AM495 pending |
2021-03-23 | Legislature | Murman AM719 filed |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Walz AM678 filed |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Walz AM677 filed |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Education AM495 filed |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM495 |
2021-03-01 | Legislature | Education priority bill |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |