NE LB528 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to use of pharmaceutical agents and use of certain treatments and procedures by optometrists
Title
Change provisions relating to use of pharmaceutical agents and use of certain treatments and procedures by optometrists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-02-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 15, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=36969 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB528.pdf |