NE LB528 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor on April 24, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor on April 24, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for partner treatment relating to sexually transmitted diseases
Title
Provide for partner treatment relating to sexually transmitted diseases
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Howard [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 24, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 37-9-3 |
2013-04-16 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-03-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2013-03-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-03-27 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM605 adopted |
2013-03-27 | Legislature | McCoy AM809 lost |
2013-03-26 | Legislature | McCoy AM809 filed |
2013-03-26 | Legislature | McCoy AM765 withdrawn |
2013-03-26 | Legislature | McCoy AM764 adopted |
2013-03-26 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM605 pending |
2013-03-25 | Legislature | Kintner AM767 lost |
2013-03-25 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM605 pending |
2013-03-21 | Legislature | Kintner AM767 filed |
2013-03-21 | Legislature | McCoy AM765 filed |
2013-03-21 | Legislature | McCoy AM764 filed |
2013-03-19 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM605 filed |
2013-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM605 |
2013-03-14 | Legislature | Howard priority bill |
2013-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |