NE LB526 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB526 amended into LB259 by AM933
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to debtor's rights, garnishment, attachment, and other debt collection procedures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to debtor's rights, garnishment, attachment, and other debt collection procedures

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB526 amended into LB259 by AM933
2017-05-23LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2017-05-23LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed
2017-05-17LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed
2017-04-12LegislatureJudiciary AM930 filed
2017-04-12LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM930
2017-01-31LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 22, 2017
2017-01-31LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 16, 2017 (cancel)
2017-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 16, 2017
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback