NE LB512 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB457 amended into LB512 by AM724
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB457 amended into LB512 by AM724
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions related to education
Title
Change provisions related to education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB457 amended into LB512 by AM724 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB398 amended into LB512 by AM724 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB235 amended into LB512 by AM724 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB175 amended into LB512 by AM724 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB123 amended into LB512 by AM724 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second with ST33 |
2017-05-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2017-05-05 | Legislature | Harr AM1346 adopted |
2017-05-05 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2017-05-05 | Legislature | Harr AM1204 withdrawn |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Harr AM1346 filed |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Harr AM1204 filed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST18 |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Groene AM1076 adopted |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Groene AM1076 filed |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Harr AM1083 adopted |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Harr AM1083 filed |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Harr MO90 withdrawn |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Harr MO90 pending |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Harr MO90 Reconsider the vote on AM1008 filed |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Harr AM1008 lost |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Harr AM1008 filed |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Briese AM970 adopted |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Morfeld AM862 adopted |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER49 adopted |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Briese AM970 filed |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER49 filed |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER49 |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Morfeld AM862 filed |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Harr AM857 lost |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Harr AM857 filed |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Harr AM845 withdrawn |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Harr AM845 filed |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Education AM724 adopted |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Education AM724 pending |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Education AM724 filed |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM724 |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Education priority bill |
2017-02-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2017 |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |