NE LB511 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions for payment of educational costs for state wards and students in residential settings
Title
Change provisions for payment of educational costs for state wards and students in residential settings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2017 |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31453 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB511.pdf |