NE LB503 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide authority for the Auditor of Public Accounts to issue subpoenas and request court orders
Title
Provide authority for the Auditor of Public Accounts to issue subpoenas and request court orders
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB503 amended into LB539 by AM487 |
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |