NE LB497 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the School District Property Tax Authority Act and change revenue and taxation provisions
Title
Adopt the School District Property Tax Authority Act and change revenue and taxation provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37256 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB497.pdf |