NE LB496 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 23, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change and provide requirements for redevelopment projects under the Community Development Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change and provide requirements for redevelopment projects under the Community Development Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 35-8-6 (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 23, 2018
2018-04-18LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 18, 2018
2018-04-18LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-04-18LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 35-8-6
2018-04-18LegislatureStinner MO353 prevailed
2018-04-18LegislatureStinner MO353 Invoke cloture filed
2018-04-18LegislatureErdman FA165 withdrawn
2018-04-18LegislatureErdman FA165 filed
2018-04-18LegislatureMotion to return to Select File failed
2018-04-18LegislatureWilliams AM2816 withdrawn
2018-04-18LegislatureFriesen AM1413 withdrawn
2018-04-10LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST73
2018-04-10LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-04-10LegislatureStinner MO350 prevailed
2018-04-10LegislatureStinner MO350 Invoke cloture filed
2018-04-10LegislatureWayne AM2914 adopted
2018-04-10LegislatureWayne AM2914 filed
2018-04-10LegislatureWilliams AM2887 adopted
2018-04-10LegislatureWilliams AM2887 filed
2018-04-10LegislatureWilliams AM1378 withdrawn
2018-04-05LegislatureWilliams AM2816 filed
2018-02-06LegislatureWilliams priority bill
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-05-23LegislatureCorrection
2017-05-16LegislatureStinner MO148 failed
2017-05-16LegislatureStinner MO148 Invoke cloture filed
2017-05-16LegislatureFriesen AM1413 pending
2017-05-16LegislatureFriesen AM1413 filed
2017-05-16LegislatureFriesen AM1414 withdrawn
2017-05-16LegislatureFriesen AM1414 filed
2017-05-16LegislatureWilliams AM1378 pending
2017-05-16LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2017-05-15LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-05-15LegislatureUrban Affairs AM470 adopted
2017-05-15LegislatureStinner MO140 prevailed
2017-05-15LegislatureStinner MO140 Invoke cloture filed
2017-05-15LegislatureChambers MO134 failed
2017-05-10LegislatureChambers MO134 Reconsider the vote to recommit to committee filed
2017-05-10LegislatureWilliams AM1378 filed
2017-05-10LegislatureGroene MO133 failed
2017-05-10LegislatureGroene MO133 Recommit to Urban Affairs Committee filed
2017-05-10LegislatureGroene MO132 failed
2017-05-10LegislatureGroene MO132 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed
2017-05-10LegislatureUrban Affairs AM470 pending
2017-03-08LegislatureUrban Affairs AM470 filed
2017-03-08LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM470
2017-03-03LegislatureWilliams priority bill
2017-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 28, 2017
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to Urban Affairs Committee
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback