NE LB49 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 6 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 6 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require a joint committee to develop a plan for creating a joint housing agency
Title
Require a joint committee to develop a plan for creating a joint housing agency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-11 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2013-02-11 | Legislature | Chambers FA5 adopted |
2013-02-11 | Legislature | Chambers FA5 filed |
2013-02-11 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2013-02-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-02-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-02-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER2 adopted |
2013-02-01 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER2 filed |
2013-02-01 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER2 |
2013-01-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-01-31 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM31 adopted |
2013-01-28 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM31 filed |
2013-01-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM31 |
2013-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2013 |
2013-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2013-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |