NE LB486 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - M. Hansen explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Veteran and Active Duty Supportive Postsecondary Institution Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Veteran and Active Duty Supportive Postsecondary Institution Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18LegislatureM. Hansen explanation of vote
2019-03-18LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 15, 2019
2019-03-15LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2019-03-15LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 41-0-8
2019-03-12LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2019-03-07LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2019-02-26LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2019-02-20LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2019-02-14LegislaturePlaced on General File
2019-02-05LegislaturePansing Brooks name added
2019-01-28LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 04, 2019
2019-01-24LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2019-01-22LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback