NE LB485 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent relating to appropriations for child welfare
Title
State intent relating to appropriations for child welfare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB485 amended into LB657 by AM829 |
2015-02-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 17, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | Legislature | Morfeld name added |
2015-02-24 | Legislature | Coash name added |
2015-02-20 | Legislature | Krist name added |
2015-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |