NE LB477 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit certain unlawful acts as prescribed relating to the Weights and Measures Act
Title
Prohibit certain unlawful acts as prescribed relating to the Weights and Measures Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Groene AM2559 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | McCollister AM2603 filed |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Agriculture AM2409 filed |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2409 |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Groene name withdrawn |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Agriculture priority bill |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2017 |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31452 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB477.pdf |