NE LB475 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB475 amended into LB1067 by AM2540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB475 amended into LB1067 by AM2540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the Angel Investment Tax Credit Act and the Business Innovation Act
Title
Change the Angel Investment Tax Credit Act and the Business Innovation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Carlson [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB475 amended into LB1067 by AM2540 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-02-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 05, 2013 |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2013 (cancel) |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Adams motion to suspend rules to permit cancellation of hearing prevailed |
2013-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2013-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18129 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB475.pdf |