NE LB474 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Lowe FA48 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Medicinal Cannabis Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Medicinal Cannabis Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - Legislature - Wishart MO67 failed (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Legislature - Slama MO65 failed (Y: 16 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12LegislatureLowe FA48 filed
2021-05-12LegislatureHansen, B. AM1429 filed
2021-05-12LegislatureFlood AM1364 filed
2021-05-12LegislatureWishart MO67 failed
2021-05-12LegislatureWishart MO67 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Section 10 filed
2021-05-12LegislatureSlama MO66 pending
2021-05-12LegislatureSlama MO66 pending
2021-05-12LegislatureSlama MO66 Reconsider the vote taken on MO65 filed
2021-05-12LegislatureSlama MO65 failed
2021-05-12LegislatureSlama MO65 pending
2021-05-12LegislatureSlama MO65 pending
2021-05-12LegislatureJudiciary AM824 pending
2021-05-12LegislatureSlama MO65 Bracket until June 10, 2021 filed
2021-03-31LegislatureJudiciary AM824 filed
2021-03-31LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM824
2021-03-12LegislatureWishart priority bill
2021-02-24LegislatureCavanaugh, J. name added
2021-02-24LegislatureMcDonnell name added
2021-02-04LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 10, 2021
2021-01-20LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-01-15LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=43730
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LB474.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM824.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/MO65.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1364.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/MO66.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1429.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/FA48.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/MO67.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/SI/LB474.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/FN/LB474_20210309-100901.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/CS/LB474.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/FN/LB474_20210507-104910.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=7036
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=7039

Bill Comments

feedback