NE LB474 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - Approved by Governor on March 16, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - Approved by Governor on March 16, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Require certain retirement reports be submitted to the
Title
Require certain retirement reports be submitted to the
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Approved by Governor on March 16, 2011 | |
2011-03-10 | Presented to Governor on March 10, 2011 | |
2011-03-10 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-03-10 | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 | |
2011-03-10 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on Final Reading Second | |
2011-02-28 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment | |
2011-02-28 | Nordquist AM417 adopted | |
2011-02-28 | Returned to Select File for specific amendment | |
2011-02-23 | Nordquist AM417 filed | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-02-17 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-02-17 | Enrollment and Review ER23 adopted | |
2011-02-11 | Enrollment and Review ER23 filed | |
2011-02-11 | Placed on Select File with ER23 | |
2011-02-09 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-02-09 | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM123 adopted | |
2011-01-28 | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM123 filed | |
2011-01-28 | Placed on General File with AM123 | |
2011-01-19 | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2011 | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee | |
2011-01-14 | Date of introduction |