NE LB471 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change prescription drug monitoring provisions and create the Veterinary Prescription Monitoring Program Task Force
Title
Change prescription drug monitoring provisions and create the Veterinary Prescription Monitoring Program Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Howard [N] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 18, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST56 |
2016-02-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-02-04 | Legislature | Howard AM1952 adopted |
2016-02-04 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER148 adopted |
2016-02-01 | Legislature | Howard AM1952 filed |
2016-01-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER148 filed |
2016-01-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER148 |
2016-01-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-01-27 | Legislature | Kuehn AM1909 adopted |
2016-01-27 | Legislature | Kuehn AM1823 withdrawn |
2016-01-27 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1809 adopted |
2016-01-27 | Legislature | Kuehn AM1909 filed |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Hansen name added |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Morfeld name added |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Kuehn name added |
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Kuehn AM1823 filed |
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1809 filed |
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1809 |
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Lindstrom priority bill |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Garrett name added |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2015 |
2015-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |