NE LB470 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-24 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-24 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Nebraska County and City Lottery Act relating to the manner of play of keno, use of electronic tickets, and authorized methods of payment
Title
Change provisions of the Nebraska County and City Lottery Act relating to the manner of play of keno, use of electronic tickets, and authorized methods of payment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2017-02-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO40 prevailed |
2017-02-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO40 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2017-02-23 | Legislature | Larson AM82 filed |
2017-02-23 | Legislature | Larson AM80 filed |
2017-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-02-21 | Legislature | General Affairs priority bill |
2017-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2017 |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30670 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB470.pdf |