NE LB470 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB274 amended into LB470 by AM444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB274 amended into LB470 by AM444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Superintendent Pay Transparency Act
Title
Adopt the Superintendent Pay Transparency Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB274 amended into LB470 by AM444 |
2014-02-13 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 13, 2014 |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 07, 2014 |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Carlson MO125 withdrawn |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Carlson MO125 Bracket until April 15, 2014 filed |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER126 adopted |
2014-01-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER126 filed |
2014-01-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER126 |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Pirsch name added |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Sullivan AM1614 adopted |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Education AM444 adopted |
2014-01-13 | Legislature | Sullivan AM1614 filed |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | Nordquist name added |
2013-03-04 | Legislature | Education AM444 filed |
2013-03-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM444 |
2013-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2013-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |