NE LB466 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Require the proration of property taxes when residential real property is sold
Title
Require the proration of property taxes when residential real property is sold
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Linehan AM927 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Legislature - Revenue AM157 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Linehan AM927 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Legislature - Revenue AM157 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 29, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2021-04-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST13 |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Linehan AM927 adopted |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Linehan AM927 filed |
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Revenue AM157 adopted |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Flood AM873 withdrawn |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Flood AM873 filed |
2021-03-25 | Legislature | Revenue AM157 filed |
2021-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM157 |
2021-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |