NE LB460 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions regulating the transportation of clients of the Department of Health and Human Services and other authorized agencies as prescribed
Title
Change provisions regulating the transportation of clients of the Department of Health and Human Services and other authorized agencies as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB460 amended into LB263 by AM538 |
2017-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2017 |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31280 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB460.pdf |