NE LB447 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB385 amended into LB447 by AM548
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB385 amended into LB447 by AM548
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt certain employees of the Nebraska State Historical Society from the State Personnel System and change election provisions for the board of trustees of the Nebraska State Historical Society
Title
Exempt certain employees of the Nebraska State Historical Society from the State Personnel System and change election provisions for the board of trustees of the Nebraska State Historical Society
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM548 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM548 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB385 amended into LB447 by AM548 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER117 adopted |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER117 filed |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER117 |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM548 adopted |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM548 filed |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM548 |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2019 |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |