NE LB447 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB986 amended into LB447 by AM1979
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB986 amended into LB447 by AM1979
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change and provide provisions relating to retirement benefits and plans
Title
Change and provide provisions relating to retirement benefits and plans
Sponsors
Sen. Heath Mello [N] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB986 amended into LB447 by AM1979 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB922 amended into LB447 by AM1979 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB805 amended into LB447 by AM1979 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB448 amended into LB447 by AM1979 |
2016-03-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 30, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 24, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Kolterman AM2546 withdrawn |
2016-03-15 | Legislature | Kolterman AM2546 filed |
2016-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Kolowski name added |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Groene name added |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Davis name added |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Kolterman AM2344 adopted |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER174 adopted |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | Kolterman AM2344 filed |
2016-02-29 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER174 filed |
2016-02-29 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER174 |
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Mello AM1815 withdrawn |
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Kolterman AM2282 adopted |
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM1979 adopted |
2016-02-24 | Legislature | Kolterman AM2282 filed |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM1979 filed |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1979 |
2016-02-11 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems priority bill |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2016, on AM1815 |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Mello AM1815 filed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB447 amended into LB448 by AM1555 |
2015-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 05, 2015 |
2015-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |