NE LB44 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Midwest Interstate Passenger Rail Compact

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Midwest Interstate Passenger Rail Compact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-04-06LegislatureRaybould name added
2023-03-03LegislatureWalz name added
2023-02-14LegislatureDay name added
2023-01-31LegislatureBostar name added
2023-01-31LegislatureAguilar name added
2023-01-31LegislatureHunt name added
2023-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 06, 2023
2023-01-10LegislatureBlood name added
2023-01-09LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2023-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback