NE LB44 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Placed on Select File
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change requirements for adoption of an affordable housing action plan

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change requirements for adoption of an affordable housing action plan

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2021-02-16LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2021-02-03LegislatureCavanaugh, M. name added
2021-01-28LegislaturePlaced on General File
2021-01-27LegislatureWayne name added
2021-01-19LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 26, 2021
2021-01-12LegislatureHunt name added
2021-01-11LegislatureReferred to Urban Affairs Committee
2021-01-07LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback