NE LB44 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Noncollecting Retailer Notice and Reporting Act
Title
Adopt the Noncollecting Retailer Notice and Reporting Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Watermeier MO272 failed |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Watermeier MO272 Invoke cloture filed |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO271 pending |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO271 Reconsider the motion to recommit to committee filed |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO270 failed |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO270 Recommit to Revenue Committee filed |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Watermeier AM2433 pending |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Watermeier AM2433 filed |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File pending |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Smith AM2261 withdrawn |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Smith AM2253 withdrawn |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Smith AM2246 withdrawn |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Smith AM2261 filed |
2018-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST46 |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Smith AM2253 filed |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Smith AM2246 filed |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Watermeier MO240 prevailed |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Watermeier MO240 Invoke cloture filed |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Chambers FA113 lost |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Chambers FA113 filed |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Watermeier AM1822 adopted |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Watermeier AM1465 withdrawn |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Watermeier AM1074 withdrawn |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Chambers FA64 withdrawn |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Watermeier AM1822 filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Watermeier priority bill |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Watermeier AM1465 filed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA64 pending |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA64 pending |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Chambers FA64 pending |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Chambers FA64 filed |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Watermeier AM1074 pending |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Watermeier AM1074 filed |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Attorney General's Opinion 17-002 to Kuehn |
2017-04-12 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2017-04-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-02-23 | Legislature | Watermeier priority bill |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |