NE LB433 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB434 amended into LB433 by AM981
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB434 amended into LB433 by AM981
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to return of tenants' deposits and damages and the time period for a written notice to quit
Title
Change provisions relating to return of tenants' deposits and damages and the time period for a written notice to quit
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 39-1-9 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Hansen, M. AM1729 adopted (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Legislature - Judiciary AM981 adopted (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Hansen, M. AM1729 adopted (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Legislature - Judiciary AM981 adopted (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB434 amended into LB433 by AM981 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 39-1-9 |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM1729 adopted |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER100 adopted |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM1729 filed |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER100 filed |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER100 |
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Judiciary AM981 adopted |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Judiciary AM981 filed |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM981 |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Hansen, M. priority bill |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2019 |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |