NE LB433 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide requirements for contracts for child welfare services between private agencies and the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Provide requirements for contracts for child welfare services between private agencies and the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-01-25 | Notice of hearing for March 16, 2011 | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2011-01-14 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12580 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB433.pdf |