NE LB432 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Nebraska Budget Act relating to allowances for delinquent taxes and anticipated litigation
Title
Change provisions of the Nebraska Budget Act relating to allowances for delinquent taxes and anticipated litigation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-04 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER34 adopted |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER34 filed |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER34 |
2017-03-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-29 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM289 adopted |
2017-03-17 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM289 filed |
2017-03-17 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM289 |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Erdman priority bill |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2017 |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |