NE LB431 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change taxation provisions relating to improvements on leased lands, the assessment of undervalued and overvalued property, methods for giving notice, and the collection of certain taxes and fees
Title
Change taxation provisions relating to improvements on leased lands, the assessment of undervalued and overvalued property, methods for giving notice, and the collection of certain taxes and fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-02-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |