NE LB430 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change tax provisions relating to net book value
Title
Change tax provisions relating to net book value
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 04, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |