NE LB430 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change powers and duties of the Department of Health and Human Services under the Radiation Control Act
Title
Change powers and duties of the Department of Health and Human Services under the Radiation Control Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 04, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER64 adopted |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER64 filed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER64 |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM176 adopted |
2017-03-07 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM176 filed |
2017-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM176 |
2017-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |