NE LB415 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB532 amended into LB415 by AM923
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to certain retirement plans as prescribed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to certain retirement plans as prescribed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB532 amended into LB415 by AM923
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB413 amended into LB415 by AM923
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB278 amended into LB415 by AM923
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB219 amended into LB415 by AM923
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB110 amended into LB415 by AM923
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB32 amended into LB415 by AM923
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB31 amended into LB415 by AM923
2017-05-23LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 23, 2017
2017-05-18LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 18, 2017
2017-05-18LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-18LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1
2017-05-18LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2017-05-18LegislatureLinehan FA82 withdrawn
2017-05-18LegislatureLinehan FA82 filed
2017-05-18LegislatureMotion to return to Select File withdrawn
2017-05-18LegislatureChambers FA81 withdrawn
2017-05-18LegislatureChambers FA81 filed
2017-05-18LegislatureMotion to return to Select File withdrawn
2017-05-16LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST34
2017-05-15LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-05-15LegislatureKolterman AM1403 adopted
2017-05-15LegislatureKolterman AM1403 filed
2017-05-15LegislatureReturned to Select File for specific amendment
2017-05-10LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-05-10LegislatureChambers MO137 withdrawn
2017-05-10LegislatureChambers MO137 Bracket until May 25, 2017 filed
2017-05-10LegislatureChambers MO136 failed
2017-05-10LegislatureChambers MO136 Reconsider the vote to indefinitely postpone filed
2017-05-10LegislatureChambers MO135 failed
2017-05-10LegislatureChambers MO135 Indefinitely postpone filed
2017-05-10LegislatureKolterman AM1374 adopted
2017-05-10LegislatureKolterman AM1374 filed
2017-05-10LegislatureKolterman AM1383 adopted
2017-05-10LegislatureKolterman AM1383 filed
2017-05-10LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER88 adopted
2017-05-09LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER88 filed
2017-05-09LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER88
2017-05-05LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-05-05LegislaturePansing Brooks MO123 withdrawn
2017-05-05LegislaturePansing Brooks MO123 Recommit to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee filed
2017-05-05LegislatureErdman MO122 withdrawn
2017-05-05LegislatureErdman MO122 Recommit to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee filed
2017-05-05LegislatureWalz AM1219 withdrawn
2017-05-05LegislatureNebraska Retirement Systems AM923 adopted
2017-05-03LegislatureWalz AM1219 pending
2017-05-03LegislatureBaker AM1211 adopted
2017-05-03LegislatureKolterman AM1230 adopted
2017-05-03LegislatureKolterman AM1000 withdrawn
2017-05-03LegislatureNebraska Retirement Systems AM923 pending
2017-05-02LegislatureKolterman AM1230 filed
2017-05-02LegislatureWalz AM1219 filed
2017-04-26LegislatureBaker AM1211 filed
2017-04-12LegislatureKolterman AM1000 filed
2017-04-10LegislatureNebraska Retirement Systems AM923 filed
2017-04-10LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM923
2017-03-03LegislatureNebraska Retirement Systems priority bill
2017-01-26LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 27, 2017
2017-01-17LegislatureReferred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
2017-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback