NE LB410 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change boundaries and number of public service commissioner districts and provide for the appointment and election of new commissioners as prescribed
Title
Change boundaries and number of public service commissioner districts and provide for the appointment and election of new commissioners as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30881 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB410.pdf |