NE LB410 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Approved by Governor on March 10, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Approved by Governor on March 10, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Nebraska Appraisal Management Company Registration Act
Title
Adopt the Nebraska Appraisal Management Company Registration Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Approved by Governor on March 10, 2011 | |
2011-03-04 | Presented to Governor on March 04, 2011 | |
2011-03-04 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-03-04 | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 | |
2011-03-04 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-02-17 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-02-17 | Utter AM360 adopted | |
2011-02-17 | Enrollment and Review ER27 adopted | |
2011-02-16 | Utter AM360 filed | |
2011-02-15 | Enrollment and Review ER27 filed | |
2011-02-15 | Placed on Select File with ER27 | |
2011-02-11 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-02-11 | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM197 adopted | |
2011-02-03 | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM197 filed | |
2011-02-03 | Placed on General File with AM197 | |
2011-01-25 | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2011 | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee | |
2011-01-13 | Date of introduction |