NE LB41 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 16, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 16, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to certain payments of funds to townships
Title
Change provisions relating to certain payments of funds to townships
Sponsors
Sen. Myron Dorn [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 16, 2021 |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2021 |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-03-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-02-05 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |