NE LB407 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create and provide duties for the Whiteclay Public Health Emergency Task Force
Title
Create and provide duties for the Whiteclay Public Health Emergency Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER18 adopted |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER18 filed |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER18 |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM528 adopted |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Executive Board AM140 adopted |
2017-03-07 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM528 filed |
2017-02-27 | Legislature | State-Tribal Relations priority bill |
2017-02-23 | Legislature | Executive Board AM140 filed |
2017-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM140 |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |