NE LB403 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Approved by Governor on February 13, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Approved by Governor on February 13, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit retail sale of novelty lighters
Title
Prohibit retail sale of novelty lighters
Sponsors
Sen. Les Seiler [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 13, 2014 |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 07, 2014 |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 34-6-9 |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST40 |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Seiler AM1769 adopted |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Seiler AM1769 filed |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER125 adopted |
2014-01-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER125 filed |
2014-01-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER125 |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Kintner AM1670 withdrawn |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Schilz AM1672 adopted |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Kintner MO117 withdrawn |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Kintner AM1670 filed |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Schilz AM1672 filed |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Kintner MO117 pending |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Kintner MO117 Reconsider the vote taken on FA177 filed |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Kintner FA177 lost |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Kintner FA177 pending |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Kintner FA177 filed |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Brasch FA176 lost |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Brasch FA176 pending |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Brasch FA176 filed |
2014-01-22 | Legislature | Kintner FA175 withdrawn |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Kintner FA175 pending |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Kintner FA175 filed |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Coash AM1660 lost |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Coash AM1660 filed |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Judiciary AM130 adopted |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-02-22 | Legislature | Judiciary AM130 filed |
2013-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM130 |
2013-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |